EP0128862 - Anti-corrosive coating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berner, Godwin, Dr. Waldhofstrasse 70 CH-4310 Rheinfelden / CH | 02 /
Hoyle, William, Dr. 29 Carrwood Avenue Bramhall Stockport Cheshire SK7 2PY / GB | 03 /
Jack, James, Dr. 6, Huxley Drive Bramhall Stockport Cheshire SK7 2PH / GB | [1984/51] | Application number, filing date | 84810218.2 | 08.05.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | GB19830013320 | 14.05.1983 Original published format: GB 8313320 | [1984/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0128862 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0128862 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128862 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/08, C25D13/06, C23F11/16, C09D5/44 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
C09D5/086 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31688 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/51] | C09D5/08, C25D13/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/51] | Title | German: | Antikorrosive Überzugsmittel | [1984/51] | English: | Anti-corrosive coating composition | [1984/51] | French: | Revêtement anti-corrosif | [1984/51] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1984 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 26.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH458048 (SANDOZ AG [CH]); | [Y]EP0003817 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]US4235838 (OUTLAW BENJAMIN T [US], et al) |