EP0128871 - Linear slideway for a carriage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1989 [1989/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydrel AG Badstrasse 14 CH-8590 Romanshorn / CH | [1984/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metelski, Andrezej Spielgasse 2 CH-8590 Romanshorn / CH | [1984/51] | Representative(s) | Haffter, Tobias Fred, et al PATENTANWALTS-BUREAU ISLER AG Postfach 6940 Walchestrasse 23 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | Haffter, Tobias Fred, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al PATENTANWALTS-BUREAU ISLER AG Postfach 6940 Walchestrasse 23 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 84810278.6 | 07.06.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | CH19830003212 | 10.06.1983 Original published format: CH 321283 | [1984/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128871 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128871 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/12, B23Q1/26 | [1984/51] | CPC: |
F16C29/0619 (EP,US);
B23Q1/262 (EP,US);
F16C29/04 (EP,US);
F16C29/0676 (EP,US);
F16C29/12 (EP,US);
F16C2322/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1984/51] | Title | German: | Umgriff an einer Linearführung eines Schlittens | [1984/51] | English: | Linear slideway for a carriage | [1984/51] | French: | Glissière linéaire pour un chariot | [1984/51] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 27.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/42] | Request for further processing for: | 26.12.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 26.12.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.1987 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 02.11.1988 | [1989/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2812034 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK); | [X]FR1460061 (GAMBIN S A); | [A]DE2346633 (WOTAN WERKE GMBH); | [A]DE1627041 (GILDEMEISTER WERKZEUGMASCH); | [A]GB1228028 ; | [A]GB899151 (JOSEPH NAGY); | [A]CH494902 (GOEBEL GUENTER [DE]); | [A]CH424390 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]); | [A]DE1168176 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK) |