EP0136259 - 4-Heterocyclyl-vinyl-4'-styryl-biphenyls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Hans Rudolf, Dr. Bollwerkstrasse 102 CH-4102 Binningen / CH | [1985/14] | Application number, filing date | 84810374.3 | 30.07.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | CH19830004266 | 05.08.1983 Original published format: CH 426683 | [1985/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0136259 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136259 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D271/06, C07D271/10, C07D271/08, C07D251/22, C07D239/26, C07D239/30, C07D239/32, C07D239/34, C07D239/38, C07D239/42, C07D239/69 | [1985/14] | CPC: |
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C07D239/52 (EP,US);
C07D239/58 (EP,US);
C07D251/16 (EP,US);
C07D251/18 (EP,US);
C07D251/20 (EP,US);
C07D261/08 (EP,US);
C07D271/06 (EP,US);
C07D271/10 (EP,US);
C07D271/107 (EP,US);
C07D271/113 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
D06L4/65 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1985/14] | Title | German: | 4-Heterocyclylvinyl-4'-styryl-biphenyle | [1985/14] | English: | 4-Heterocyclyl-vinyl-4'-styryl-biphenyls | [1985/14] | French: | Hétérocyclyl-4-styryl-4' biphényles | [1985/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.08.1984 | Examination requested [1985/14] | 28.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 26.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2712686 (BAYER AG); | [A]EP0031796 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]DD153714 (CIBA GEIGY AG) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 98, No. 10, 7. Marz 1983, Columbus, ohio, USA GALUNOV, N.Z.; GUNDER, O.A.; KOPINA, I.V.; TSIRLIN, YU. A. "Study of the shape of scintillation light pulses of fast-res- ponse plastic scintillators based on polyvinylxylene." Seite 480, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung Nr. 80 124e; & Prib. Tekh. Eksp. 1982, (6), 38-40 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 88, No. 8, 20. Fabruar 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA SIEGRIST, ADOLF EMIL; KORMANY, GEZA; KABAS, GUGLIELMO; SCHLAEPFER HANS. "Anil synthesis. Part 15. Preparation of heterocyclic substituted stilbenyl derivatives of 2H-1,2,3-triazole." Seite 56, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung Nr. 51 934g; & Helv. Chim. Acta 1977, 60(7), 2334-70 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 97, No. 11, 13. September 1982, Columbus, Ohio, USA KRASOVITSKII, B.M.; EGOROVA, N.P.; AFANASIADI, L. SH.; LYSOVA, I.V.; POLYAKOV, V.K.; TSUKERMAN, S.V. "Synthesis and spectral-luminescent properties of hetarylethylene derivatives of 2,5-diphenyloxazole and 2,5-diphenyl-1,3,4- oxadiazole." Seite 765, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung Nr. 92 212z; & Khim. Geterotsikl. Soedin. 1982, (5), 617-21 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 92, No. 6,11. Februar 1980, Columbus, Ohio, USA PALMBERG, ROGER B,; SIEGRIST, ADOLF EMIL. "Anil synthesis. Part 21. Preparation of stilbenyl derivatives of pyrazole." Seite 64, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung Nr. 43 264f; & Helv. Chim. Acta 1979, 62(6), 1816-63 | Examination | CH619336 | GB1360142 |