EP0140831 - Method and apparatus for eliminating the waviness of tooth flanks at gear manufacturing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1989 [1989/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maag-Zahnräder und -Maschinen Aktiengesellschaft Hardstrasse 219 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bloch, Peter, Dr. sc. techn. Sonnenbergstrasse 4 CH-8968 Mutschellen / CH | 02 /
Schneider, Otto, dipl. El.-Ing. HTL Rütihof 359 CH-5722 Gränichen / CH | 03 /
Donner, Meinrad Kirchweg 5 CH-8855 Nuolen / CH | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Travnicek, Richard MAAG-ZAHNRÄDER & -MASCHINEN AG Patentabteilung Hardstrasse 219 8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | Travnicek, Richard MAAG-ZAHNRÄDER & -MASCHINEN AG Patentabteilung Hardstrasse 219 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1985/19] | Travnicek, Richard Maag Zahnräder & -Maschinen Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung Postfach CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 84810426.1 | 29.08.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | CH19830005659 | 18.10.1983 Original published format: CH 565983 | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0140831 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140831 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B23F5/02, G05D13/62, G05B19/18 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
G05B19/186 (EP,US);
B23F23/006 (EP,US);
B23F23/10 (EP,US);
B23F5/08 (EP,US);
Y10T409/102226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/19] | B23F5/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1985/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Beseitigen der Zahnflanken-Welligkeit auf Zahnradproduktionsmaschinen | [1985/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for eliminating the waviness of tooth flanks at gear manufacturing machines | [1985/19] | French: | Procédé et arrangement pour l'élimination de l'ondulation des flancs des dents en machines à usiner les engrenages | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 24.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2724664 [ ]; | EP0021329 [ ] (MAAG ZAHNRAEDER & MASCHINEN AG [CH]); | EP0079965 [ ] (FANUC LTD [JP]) | Examination | DE2161243 |