EP0129523 - An electrode chamber unit intended for an electrochemical cell having a porous percolation electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ElectroCell Systems AB Tumstocksvägen 10 S-183 66 Täby / SE | [1988/29] |
Former [1984/52] | For all designated states ElectroCell AB Box 34 S-184 00 Akersberga / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bjäreklint, Ake Bällstavägen 72 S-186 00 Vallentuna / SE | 02 /
Simonsson, Daniel Erikslundsvägen 48 S-183 44 Täby / SE | [1984/52] | Representative(s) | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1984/52] | Burman, Tore AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850183.9 | 13.06.1984 | [1984/52] | Priority number, date | SE19830003494 | 17.06.1983 Original published format: SE 8303494 | [1984/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129523 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129523 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C25C7/02, C25B11/02, C02F1/46 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
C25C7/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/46114 (EP,US);
C25B9/40 (EP,US);
C25B9/70 (EP,US);
C25B9/73 (US);
C25B9/75 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/52] | Title | German: | Elektrodenkammereinheit für eine elektrochemische Zelle mit einer porösen Filterelektrode | [1984/52] | English: | An electrode chamber unit intended for an electrochemical cell having a porous percolation electrode | [1984/52] | French: | Unité de chambre à électrode pour une cellule électrochimique ayant une électrode poreuse percolante | [1984/52] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 07.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.1989 | BE | 27.09.1989 | NL | 27.09.1989 | SE | 27.09.1989 | [1991/12] |
Former [1990/42] | AT | 27.09.1989 | |
NL | 27.09.1989 | ||
SE | 27.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/27] | NL | 27.09.1989 | |
SE | 27.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | SE | 27.09.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2622497 [ ] (DECHEMA DEUTSCHE GES F CHEM AP); | DE2948579 [ ] (HSA REACTORS LTD); | DE2904539 [ ] (CARBONE AG) | Examination | EP0122736 |