EP0138791 - Safety device for venting excess pressure in wet capacitor containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1989 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIFA AB Box 945 S-391 29 KALMAR / SE | [1988/35] |
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON Patent and Trademark Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulming, Lennart Evald Röttle S-563 00 Gränna / SE | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Nydell, Peder Nydells Patentbyra Hägnen 2573 380 30 Rockneby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | Nydell, Peder Nydells Patentbyra Hägnen 2573 S-380 30 Rockneby / SE | ||
Former [1988/29] | Hedberg, Sten Torsten Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson, Patent and Trademark Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1987/24] | Biriell, Gustav Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1985/17] | Szemere, Fredrik Civilingenjör Fredrik Szemere Patentbyra Erik Dahlbergsgatan 27 S-115 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850276.1 | 18.09.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | SE19830005609 | 12.10.1983 Original published format: SE 8305609 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138791 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138791 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01G1/08, H01G9/12 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
H01G2/14 (EP,US);
H01G9/12 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7929 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/17] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung zur Entlassung des Überdrucks eines Flüssigkeitskondensatorbehälters | [1985/24] | English: | Safety device for venting excess pressure in wet capacitor containers | [1985/17] | French: | Dispositif de sûreté pour relâcher la pression excessive dans des boîtiers des condensateurs liquides | [1985/24] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/32] | 20.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 23.09.1986 | 03   M02   Fee paid on   13.10.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1146369 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US3538402 (KAMERON WILLIAM); | [A]GB1370754 (SIEMENS AG) |