EP0145685 - A cement mortar and concrete with a reduced water absorption and a method for manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.03.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyrand AB Ryetvägen 5 430 80 Hovas / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states Polyrand AB Ryetvägen 5 S-430 80 Hovas / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flodin, Per Ryetvägen 5 S-430 80 Hovas / SE | 02 /
Magnusson, Olof Petter Hernquistsv. 6 S-443 00 Lerum / SE | 03 /
Chandra, Satish Karl Gustavsgatan 22B S-411 25 Göteborg / SE | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al GÖTEBORGS PATENTBYRA AB Box 5005 S-402 21 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 84850329.8 | 29.10.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | SE19830006039 | 03.11.1983 Original published format: SE 8306039 | [1985/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0145685 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145685 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0145685 | Date: | 08.08.1988 | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/26 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
C04B24/2641 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/25] | Title | German: | Zementmörtel und Beton mit einer verminderten Wasserabsorption und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1985/25] | English: | A cement mortar and concrete with a reduced water absorption and a method for manufacture thereof | [1985/25] | French: | Mortier de ciment et béton ayant une absorption d'eau réduite et procédé de sa fabrication | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/09] | 26.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.1989
23.02.1989
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.1989
23.02.1989
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1989/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.1989
HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE | 27.02.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.06.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.09.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 01.12.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/17] | Appeal following opposition | 18.11.1991 | Appeal received No. T0916/91 | 22.01.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.11.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.12.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.1988 | CH | 31.10.1989 | LI | 31.10.1989 | BE | 31.10.1991 | NL | 01.05.1992 | GB | 29.10.1993 | DE | 01.07.1994 | [2002/40] |
Former [1995/03] | AT | 20.04.1988 | |
CH | 20.04.1988 | ||
LI | 20.04.1988 | ||
BE | 31.10.1991 | ||
NL | 01.05.1992 | ||
GB | 29.10.1993 | ||
DE | 01.07.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | AT | 20.04.1988 | |
CH | 20.04.1988 | ||
LI | 20.04.1988 | ||
BE | 31.10.1991 | ||
NL | 01.05.1992 | ||
GB | 29.10.1993 | ||
Former [1992/38] | AT | 20.04.1988 | |
CH | 20.04.1988 | ||
LI | 20.04.1988 | ||
BE | 31.10.1991 | ||
NL | 01.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | AT | 20.04.1988 | |
CH | 20.04.1988 | ||
LI | 20.04.1988 | ||
NL | 01.05.1992 | ||
Former [1989/26] | AT | 20.04.1988 | |
CH | 20.04.1988 | ||
LI | 20.04.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 20.04.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB1159377 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [A]US4263372 (EMMONS WILLIAM D, et al); | [A]EP0069586 (MARLEY TILE AG [CH], et al); | [AP]EP0097513 (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]) |