EP0150699 - Multicomponent gas separation membranes having polyphosphazene coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167-7020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167-7020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murphy, Milton Keith Tompkins 1036 St. Charles Missouri 63301 / US | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | McLean, Peter, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | [1985/32] | Application number, filing date | 84870187.6 | 21.12.1984 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | US19830566132 | 28.12.1983 Original published format: US 566132 | [1985/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150699 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150699 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04, B01D53/22, C08L85/02 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
C09D185/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/12 (EP);
B01D71/72 (EP,US);
C08L85/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/32] | Title | German: | Mehrkomponentenmembranen mit Polyphosphazenbeschichtungen zur Trennung von Gasen | [1985/32] | English: | Multicomponent gas separation membranes having polyphosphazene coatings | [1985/32] | French: | Membranes à composants mutliples comprenant des revêtements de polyphosphazène pour la séparation de gaz | [1985/32] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/43] | 23.05.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JPS59154105 ; | [YD]US4230463 (HENIS JAY M S, et al); | [XP]FR2542211 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 4, 28th January 1985, page 63, no. 25961b, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 154 105 (ASAHI GLASS CO.LTD.) 03-09-1984 |