EP0122908 - Method of separating polluted liquid mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innova Wiener Innovationsgesellschaft m.b.H. Beatrixgasse 1 A-1030 Wien III / AT | [1984/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrems, Emil Neustift a. Walde 41 A-1190 Wien / AT | [1984/43] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Andreas Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | Rippel, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 A-1130 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 84890040.3 | 06.03.1984 | [1984/43] | Priority number, date | AT19830000880 | 11.03.1983 Original published format: AT 88083 | [1984/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0122908 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0122908 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/20, B01D19/00 | [1984/43] | CPC: |
B01D19/0036 (EP,US);
C02F1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trennung von verunreinigten Flüssigkeitsgemischen | [1984/43] | English: | Method of separating polluted liquid mixtures | [1984/43] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation de mélanges liquides pollués | [1984/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 09.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.06.1987 | FR | 03.06.1987 | IT | 03.06.1987 | NL | 03.06.1987 | SE | 30.06.1987 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 03.06.1987 | |
IT | 03.06.1987 | ||
NL | 03.06.1987 | ||
SE | 30.06.1987 | ||
Former [1989/18] | BE | 03.06.1987 | |
NL | 03.06.1987 | ||
SE | 30.06.1987 | ||
Former [1989/02] | BE | 03.06.1987 | |
NL | 03.06.1987 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 03.06.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR598498 (G & J WEIR LTD); | [X]GB490022 (EDWIN THOMAS WEBB, et al); | [X]DE1517479 (PINTSCH BAMAG AG); | [A]US3528890 (BROWN MELVIN HENRY); | [X]US3898058 (MCGILL JAMES C); | [A]FR2342251 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [X]EP0005138 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | [X]DE2935078 (KLEIN HANS ULRICH ING GRAD, et al) | Examination | EP0080420 | EP0099320 |