EP0122254 - Automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.07.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1989 | Opposition rejected | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL Gesellschaft für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen und Messtechnik mbH.Prof.Dr.Dr.h.c. Hans List Kleiststrasse 48 8020 Graz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states AVL Gesellschaft für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen und Messtechnik mbH.Prof.Dr.Dr.h.c. Hans List Kleiststrasse 48 A-8020 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirchweger, Karl Stiftingtalstrasse 71 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Knopf, Franz Papiermühlgasse 19/9 A-8020 Graz / AT | 03 /
Thien, Gerhard Stiftingtalstrasse 71 A-8010 Graz / AT | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Krause, Walter Patentanwälte Babeluk - Krause, Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Krause, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 200 Singerstrasse 8 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 84890065.0 | 03.04.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | AT19830001267 | 08.04.1983 Original published format: AT 126783 | AT19830002370 | 28.06.1983 Original published format: AT 237083 | AT19830003040 | 25.08.1983 Original published format: AT 304083 | [1984/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0122254 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0122254 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/08, B60K11/08 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
B60K13/04 (EP,US);
B60K11/08 (EP,US);
B60R13/0838 (EP,US);
B60R13/0884 (EP,US);
F01P1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1984/42] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug | [1984/42] | English: | Automotive vehicle | [1984/42] | French: | Véhicule automobile | [1984/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 06.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.1988
25.04.1988
ADMISSIBLE Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 600202 D-70302 Stuttgart / DE | [1988/19] | 27.04.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.08.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.09.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 31.03.1989 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.04.1989 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH202998 (RINGHOFFER TATRA WERKE AG [CZ]); | [A]FR2314088 (LIST HANS [AT]); | [X]FR2331111 (BERTIN & CIE [FR]); | [A]FR2364779 (LIST HANS [AT]); | [A]FR2402768 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [AD]FR2448448 (LIST HANS [AT]); | [A]DE2913648 (PALETSCHEK MANFRED ING GRAD); | [A]DE2952190 (MAGIRUS DEUTZ AG [DE]); | [A]DE3019513 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3225347 (LIST HANS [AT]) | Examination | GB2002850 | AT369700B |