EP0127673 - METHOD FOR PRESERVATION OF LIVING ORGANIC TISSUE BY FREEZING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McKENNA, Joan J. 2811 Grove Street Berkeley, CA 94703 / US | [1984/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/50] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/50] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys.Rotermund B.Sc. Morgan, Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84900223.3 | 30.11.1983 | [1984/50] | WO1983US01888 | Priority number, date | US19820448467 | 10.12.1982 Original published format: US 448467 | [1984/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402389 | Date: | 21.06.1984 | [1984/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0127673 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F25D25/00, F24F3/16, F25B19/00, A23K3/02, A23C3/00 | [1984/50] | CPC: |
A23B7/0425 (EP,US);
C12N1/00 (KR);
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A01N1/0289 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PRÄSERVIEREN VON LEBENDEM ORGANISCHEM GEWEBE DURCH EINFRIEREN | [1984/50] | English: | METHOD FOR PRESERVATION OF LIVING ORGANIC TISSUE BY FREEZING | [1984/50] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRESERVER UN TISSU ORGANIQUE VIVANT PAR CONGELATION | [1984/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1984 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1984 | Search fee paid | 30.07.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 03.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 17.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/48] | 01.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/48] | Request for further processing for: | 08.11.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.12.1984 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.1986 | 01.12.1987 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.1987 | 30.11.1988 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.1989 | 30.11.1989 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.1990 | 30.11.1990 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1991 | 02.12.1991 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR385503 (JULES BOUDRY [FR]); | [A]US1422627 (COUTTS SHAW JOHN); | [A]FR911025 ; | [A]US2832690 (LOUIS BRUNSING REX, et al); | [A]US2894845 (STODDARD EDGAR S); | [Y]FR1274401 (EXPL DE PROCEDES IND SOC ET); | [Y]US3082097 (CHARLES HALLER AUGUSTINE); | [A]US3110163 (WEBB WELLS A); | [A]FR1371112 (LEYBOLDS NACHFOLGER E); | [A]US3219463 (LAMB FRANK G); | [A]US3320757 (PAULIUKONIS RICHARD S); | [A]US3413818 (PELMULDER JOHN P); | [Y]AT292436B (STARKE ARMIN DR [DE]); | [X]FR2110903 (KIDSON CHRISTOFFEL); | [Y]EP0055683 (FRITSCH SA [FR]) | [Y] - FOOD TECHNOLOGY, vol. 34, no. 3, March 1980, pages 64-71, Institute of Food Technologists, Chicago, Illinois, US; W. JAMIESON: "Use of hypobaric conditions for refrigerated storage of meats, fruits, and vegetables" | International search | [A]US1422627 (COUTTS SHAW JOHN); | [A]US2304192 (NEWTON ALWIN B); | [A]US2507527 (ROBERT JOHNSON); | [A]US2786342 (GOETZ CHARLES E); | [A]US2832690 (LOUIS BRUNSING REX, et al); | [A]US3077036 (KARLHEINZ NEUMANN); | [A]US3180738 (LASSEN SVEN H); | [A]US3219463 (LAMB FRANK G); | [A]US4054672 (INOUE KIYOSHI, et al); | [A]US4252001 (MUSSCHOOT ALBERT) |