EP0129607 - SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATING BEAUTY TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YA-MAN LTD 6 Floor Nisshin Bldg. 9-5 Nihonbashikayabacho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states YA-MAN LTD 6 Floor Nisshin Bldg. 9-5 Nihonbashikayabacho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Iwao 2 Floor Yamaya Bldg. 3-9, Monzennakacho 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMICHI, Yuji 2 Floor Yamaya Bldg. 3-9, Monzennakacho 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135 / JP | 03 /
ABE, Keizo 2 Floor Yamaya Bldg. 3-9, Monzennakacho 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135 / JP | 04 /
OKUDERA, Tatsuya 2 Floor Yamaya Bldg. 3-9, Monzennakacho 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135 / JP | [1985/01] | Representative(s) | Flügel, Otto Flügel Preissner Kastel, Postfach 81 05 06 81905 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser & Flügel, Postfach 81 05 06 D-81905 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/05] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser & Flügel Postfach 81 05 40 D-8000 München 81 / DE | ||
Former [1985/01] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser, Flügel & Säger Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 56 Postfach 81 05 40 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84900302.5 | 27.12.1983 | [1985/01] | WO1983JP00459 | Priority number, date | JP19820195907U | 28.12.1982 Original published format: JP 19590782 U | JP19830126870 | 14.07.1983 Original published format: JP 12687083 | [1985/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402461 | Date: | 05.07.1984 | [1984/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129607 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/41, A45D26/00 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
A45D44/02 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B18/203 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00476 (EP,US);
A61N5/0617 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR SELBSTTÄTIGEN SCHÖNHEITSBEHANDLUNG | [1985/01] | English: | SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATING BEAUTY TREATMENT | [1985/01] | French: | SYSTEME D'AUTOMATISATION DE TRAITEMENTS COSMETIQUES | [1985/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1984 | Translation filed | 27.08.1984 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1984 | Search fee paid | 27.08.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 06.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/41] | 17.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3315678 (DONELSON ARTHUR W); | [X]GB2052994 (COHEN J J) | International search | [A]JPS5576641 (INVERNESS INT) |