EP0132268 - COVER PANELS WITH UPPER DECORATIVE SURFACE INTENDED TO PREVENT FIRE PROPAGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.1986 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAJDUSZOBOSZLOI BUZAKALASZ MTSZ Hajdusyoboszlo Ujvárosi utfél 4 / HU | [1985/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAMOS, Károly Bécsi ut 215 H-1032 Budapest / HU | 02 /
SIMETA, József Krisztina tér 10 H-1013 Budapest / HU | [1985/05] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/05] | Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84900528.5 | 19.01.1984 | [1985/05] | WO1984HU00003 | Priority number, date | HU19830000167 | 19.01.1983 Original published format: HU 16783 | [1985/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402941 | Date: | 02.08.1984 | [1984/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132268 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/94, E06B5/16, C04B15/16, C04B43/04, E04C2/04, E04C2/26, E04F13/00 | [1985/05] | CPC: |
B32B13/04 (EP,US);
C04B28/02 (EP);
E04C2/04 (EP);
E04F13/0871 (EP);
E06B5/16 (EP);
B32B2307/304 (US);
B32B2307/3065 (US);
B32B2307/714 (US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
B32B2607/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/10, C04B14/18, C04B14/40, C04B41/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1985/05] | Title | German: | ABDECKPLATTEN MIT DEKORATIVER OBERFLÄCHE, DIE FÜR VERHINDERUNG VON BRANDENSBREITUNG GEEIGNET SIND | [1985/05] | English: | COVER PANELS WITH UPPER DECORATIVE SURFACE INTENDED TO PREVENT FIRE PROPAGATION | [1985/05] | French: | PANNEAUX DE RECOUVREMENT AVEC SURFACE SUPERIEURE DECORATIVE CON US POUR EMPECHER LA PROPAGATION DU FEU | [1985/05] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.1984 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1984 | Search fee paid | 19.10.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 11.11.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2312618 (HILDENER FILZ PRODUKT GMBH CO [DE]); | [Y]US3147177 (OWENS WILLIAM G, et al); | [A]GB909332 (GLAS & SPIEGEL MANUFACTUR AG); | [XP]DE3139053 (ROEMMLER H RESOPAL WERK GMBH [DE]) | International search | [Y]US3994110 (ROPELLA LEONARD A); | [Y]SU885239 (KI NI PI TIPOVOGO EX PROEKT [SU]); | [Y]GB1083809 (HERBERT CHARLES SCHULZE) |