EP0135543 - A COMFORT AID FOR SPORTS PERSONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.1985 [1985/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIGENI, Felix Anthony 78 Power Street Doonside, NSW 2767 / AU | For all designated states BORG, Anthony George 78 Power Street Doonside, NSW 2767 / AU | [1985/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/14] | Application number, filing date | 84900843.8 | 29.02.1984 | [1985/14] | WO1984AU00030 | Priority number, date | AU19830011952 | 01.03.1983 Original published format: AU 1195283 | [1985/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8403422 | Date: | 13.09.1984 | [1984/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0135543 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/00 | [1985/14] | CPC: |
A41D20/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/14] | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR STEIGERUNG DES WOHLBEFINDENS VON SPORTLERN | [1985/14] | English: | A COMFORT AID FOR SPORTS PERSONS | [1985/14] | French: | ACCESSOIRE POUR LE BIEN-ETRE DES SPORTIFS | [1985/14] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 08.03.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1985/36] | 09.05.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.12.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 03.12.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 03.12.1984 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 03.12.1984 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 03.12.1984 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 03.12.1984 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 03.12.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 03.12.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 03.12.1984 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.03.1985 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3567119 ; | [Y]US4244057 |