EP0138862 - HEATED GAS BLOWER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKILTEN ELECTRONICS LIMITED 36 Reynards Road Welwyn Hertfordshire AL6 9TP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/18] | For all designated states SKILTEN ELECTRONICS LIMITED 36 Reynards Road Welwyn Hertfordshire AL6 9TP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWSKILL, Robert 115 Orchard Way Knebworth Hertfordshire S63 6BT / GB | [1985/18] | Application number, filing date | 84900998.0 | 07.03.1984 | [1985/18] | WO1984GB00070 | Priority number, date | GB19830006199 | 07.03.1983 Original published format: GB 8306199 | [1985/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8403552 | Date: | 13.09.1984 | [1984/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138862 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F24H3/04, F24H9/20 | [1985/18] | CPC: |
F24H3/0423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/18] | Title | German: | GEHEIZTE GASBLASVORRICHTUNG | [1985/18] | English: | HEATED GAS BLOWER DEVICE | [1985/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOUFFLERIE A GAZ CHAUFFE | [1985/18] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/46] | 02.05.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1985/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.12.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 07.12.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 07.12.1984 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 07.12.1984 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 07.12.1984 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 07.12.1984 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 07.12.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 07.12.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 07.12.1984 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.03.1985 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | CH445671 [ ] (DITZLER WALTER ROBERT [CH]); | US3610881 [ ] (STEWART TRIGG) |