EP0170654 - HIGH STRENGTH BUCKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1990 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | ||
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCAS, Victor, A. 311 N. Kendall Drive Yorkville, IL 60560 / US | [1986/07] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/07] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84901301.6 | 08.03.1984 | [1986/07] | WO1984US00356 | Priority number, date | US19840574794 | 27.01.1984 Original published format: US 574794 | [1986/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503320 | Date: | 01.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0170654 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170654 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/40 | [1986/07] | CPC: |
E02F3/401 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1986/07] | Title | German: | SCHAUFEL MIT VERSTÄRKUNGEN | [1986/07] | English: | HIGH STRENGTH BUCKET | [1986/07] | French: | BENNE A HAUTE RESISTANCE | [1986/07] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1985 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 11.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE1211992 [ ] (CLARK EQUIPMENT CO); | US4086712 [ ] (MCREYNOLDS CHARLES P); | US4324525 [ ] (LANE JOHN, et al); | US4395193 [ ] (CHRISTENSEN ROBERT B, et al) |