EP0138987 - FOUR-QUADRANT GATE-SIZING TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.1991 [1991/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O.Box 45066 Los Angeles California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1986/28] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1985/18] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASSAEL, David 1136 Cardiff Circle Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | 02 /
RUBEN, Lawrence, M. 22768 Macfarland Drive Woodland Hills, CA 91364 / US | [1985/18] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/18] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 84901663.9 | 27.03.1984 | [1985/18] | WO1984US00475 | Priority number, date | US19830480967 | 31.03.1983 Original published format: US 480967 | [1985/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8403950 | Date: | 11.10.1984 | [1984/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138987 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138987 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/78, G01S17/66 | [1985/18] | CPC: |
G01S3/7864 (EP,US);
G05B13/00 (KR);
G01S17/66 (EP,US);
G01S3/78 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/18] | Title | German: | ANPASSUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN VIERSEKTORENFENSTER | [1985/18] | English: | FOUR-QUADRANT GATE-SIZING TECHNIQUE | [1985/18] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE DIMENSIONNEMENT A PORTE A QUATRE QUADRANTS | [1985/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1984 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/18] | 30.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3903357 [ ] (WOOLFSON MARTIN G, et al); | US3953670 [ ] (PRINCE PAUL R); | US4053929 [ ] (COLLINS III ROBERT H, et al); | EP0020795 [ ] (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO) |