EP0179056 - EXTENDED THRESHOLD ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERSION APPARATUS FOR AN RF RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1986/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANC, Robert, Vincent 6650 West 131 Street Palos Heights, IL 60463 / US | [1986/18] | Representative(s) | Ibbotson, Harold, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | Ibbotson, Harold, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG 21 1PL / GB | ||
Former [1989/27] | Ibbotson, Harold, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG 21 1PL / GB | ||
Hudson, Peter David Motorola, European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | |||
Former [1989/05] | Hirsz, Christopher Stanislaw "Spindlewood" Hollybush Lane West Heath Baughurst Basingstoke, Hampshire RG26 5LB / GB | ||
Hudson, Peter David Motorola, European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | |||
Former [1986/18] | Ibbotson, Harold Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | ||
Hudson, Peter David Motorola, European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84901896.5 | 20.04.1984 | [1986/18] | WO1984US00616 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504995 | Date: | 07.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179056 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179056 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/20, H04B1/06 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
H03M1/201 (EP);
H04B14/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/18] | Title | German: | AD-WANDLER MIT AUSGEDEHNTER SCHWELLE FÜR EINEN RF-EMPFÄNGER | [1986/18] | English: | EXTENDED THRESHOLD ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERSION APPARATUS FOR AN RF RECEIVER | [1986/18] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE-NUMERIQUE A SEUIL PROLONGE POUR RECEPT EUR HF | [1986/18] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1985 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/18] | 12.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.1991 | [1992/46] | Cited in | International search | [X]GB873926 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [Y]US3877022 (LEHMAN JOSEPH L, et al); | [A]US3879724 (MCDONALD JOHN C); | [A]FR2308257 (ROLM CORP [US]); | [A]GB1580178 (POST OFFICE) |