EP0172171 - FEEDERS FOR HEADED FASTENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIETEK PTY. LTD. 802 Boundary Road Coopers Plains, QLD 4108 / AU | [1986/36] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states FURMA MANUFACTURING CO. PTY. LTD. 802 Boundary Road Coopers Plains, QLD 4108 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUHRMEISTER, Ralph 802 Boundary Road Coopers Plains, QLD 4108 / AU | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Woodin, Anthony John, et al Fitzpatricks Europe House Box No. 88 World Trade Centre East Smithfield London E1 9AA / GB | [1986/09] | Application number, filing date | 84901942.7 | 24.05.1984 | [1986/09] | WO1984AU00093 | Priority number, date | AU19830009567 | 27.05.1983 Original published format: AU 956783 | AU19830002864 | 16.12.1983 Original published format: AU 286483 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8404710 | Date: | 06.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0172171 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172171 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.12.1984 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B21J15/32, B25B23/04, B25C1/04, B25C1/18, B25C3/00, B25C5/00 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
B21J15/32 (EP,US);
B01D53/04 (KR);
B21J15/025 (EP,US);
B21J15/10 (EP,US);
B21J15/323 (EP,US);
C01B13/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/09] | Title | German: | ZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTE MIT KOPF | [1986/09] | English: | FEEDERS FOR HEADED FASTENERS | [1986/09] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'ALIMENTATION POUR ELEMENTS D'ATTACHE A TETE | [1986/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1985 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1985 | Search fee paid | 14.11.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 19.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/09] | 30.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]AU5741969B ; | [X]US2680246 (RAMBO ARTHUR M); | [Y]US2923937 ; | [Y]FR1234978 ; | [Y]FR1531728 ; | [Y]CH470239 (REICH MASCHF GMBH KARL [DE]); | [Y]GB1163790 (SIGNODE CORP [US]); | [X]DE1923712 (REICH MASCHF GMBH KARL); | [X]US3698599 (FERNSTROM GUSTAF HARRY); | [Y]GB1333834 (RIVTAC BLINDNIETEN AG); | [Y]US3826419 (MAESTRI G); | [X]US4014488 (POTUCEK FRANK R, et al); | [Y]AU1738176 (TEXTRON INC); | [Y]AU2886977 (KARL M REICH MASCHF G M B H); | [Y]AU6811881 (FURMA MFG CO PTY LTD) |