EP0143817 - A METHOD OF PRINTING A PATTERN ON A SURFACE RECEPTIVE TO SUBLIMATION PRINTING, AND A SUBLIMATION FOIL FOR USE IN THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1988 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A/S MODULEX Klovervej 101 DK-7190 Billund / DK | [1985/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORRESEN, Peter Albert Norrebjerget 13 DK-7100 Vejle / DK | [1985/24] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 22767 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1985/24] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84901982.3 | 16.05.1984 | [1985/24] | WO1984DK00039 | Priority number, date | DK19830002193 | 17.05.1983 Original published format: DK 219383 | [1985/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8404496 | Date: | 22.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143817 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143817 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/16, B41M3/12 | [1985/24] | CPC: |
B41M5/035 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T156/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DRUCKEN EINES MUSTERS AUF EINE FÜR SUBLIMATIONSDRUCK EMPFÄNGLICHE OBERFLÄCHE UND SUBLIMATIONSBLATT ZUR VERWENDUNG GEMÄSS DIESEM VERFAHREN | [1985/24] | English: | A METHOD OF PRINTING A PATTERN ON A SURFACE RECEPTIVE TO SUBLIMATION PRINTING, AND A SUBLIMATION FOIL FOR USE IN THE METHOD | [1985/24] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION D'UN MOTIF SUR UNE SURFACE SENSIBLE A UNE IMPRESSION PAR SUBLIMATION, ET FEUILLE DE SUBLIMATION UTILISEE DANS CE PROCEDE | [1985/24] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.1985 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/24] | 13.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 20.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.1987 | BE | 19.11.1987 | CH | 19.11.1987 | FR | 19.11.1987 | LI | 19.11.1987 | NL | 19.11.1987 | SE | 30.11.1987 | LU | 31.05.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 19.11.1987 | |
BE | 19.11.1987 | ||
CH | 19.11.1987 | ||
LI | 19.11.1987 | ||
NL | 19.11.1987 | ||
SE | 30.11.1987 | ||
LU | 31.05.1988 | ||
Former [1989/25] | AT | 19.11.1987 | |
BE | 19.11.1987 | ||
CH | 19.11.1987 | ||
LI | 19.11.1987 | ||
NL | 19.11.1987 | ||
SE | 30.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/21] | AT | 19.11.1987 | |
BE | 19.11.1987 | ||
NL | 19.11.1987 | ||
SE | 30.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 19.11.1987 | |
BE | 19.11.1987 | ||
NL | 19.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/10] | BE | 19.11.1987 | |
NL | 19.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 19.11.1987 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2116032 ; | [Y]DE2452777 (CHAMPION PRODUCTS); | [Y]GB2013574 (COSTA D D DE); | [Y]DE2847702 | [Y] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, abstract of JP 56-2187 (TOPPAN INSATSU KK) 10 Januarary 1981 |