EP0145736 - MACHINE DISHWASHING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EKA AB Fack S-445 01 Surte 1 / SE | [1985/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMBERG, Krister Dalgangsgatan 17 S-431 39 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
SÖRENSSON, Olle Granitvägen 37 S-437 00 Lindome / SE | [1985/26] | Application number, filing date | 84902094.6 | 27.04.1984 | [1985/26] | WO1984SE00157 | Priority number, date | SE19830002507 | 03.05.1983 Original published format: SE 8302507 | [1985/26] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8404324 | Date: | 08.11.1984 | [1984/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0145736 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C11D7/42 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
C11D3/38609 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/26] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE | [1985/26] | English: | MACHINE DISHWASHING COMPOSITION | [1985/26] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LAVAGE DE VAISSELLE EN MACHINE | [1985/26] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1984 | Translation filed | Examination procedure | 09.04.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/50] | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1985/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.02.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 04.02.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.05.1985 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]SE385018 ; | [Y]SE424739 |