EP0151146 - LEAF SPRINGS OF COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN TECHNOLOGY LIMITED Birmingham New Road Wolverhampton West Midlands WV4 6BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | For all designated states GKN TECHNOLOGY LIMITED Birmingham New Road Wolverhampton West Midlands WV4 6BW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUCKER-PEAKE, Adrian Beggars Roost 17 Lancaster Avenue Rubery Birmingham B45 9YQ / GB | 02 /
HEMMINGS, Graham 17 Watts Close Lynwood Park Tipton West Midlands DY4 8BA / GB | [1985/33] | Representative(s) | Dodd, Graham Marshall, et al Guest Keen and Nettlefolds plc Group Patents and Licensing Department P.O. Box 55 Ipsley House, Ipsley Church Lane Redditch, Worcestershire B98 0TL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | Dodd, Graham Marshall, et al Guest Keen and Nettlefolds plc Group Patents and Licensing Department P.O. Box 55 Ipsley House Ipsley Church Lane Redditch Worcestershire B98 0TL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84902598.6 | 29.06.1984 | [1985/33] | WO1984GB00233 | Priority number, date | GB19830019282 | 16.07.1983 Original published format: GB 8319282 | [1985/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8500643 | Date: | 14.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0151146 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151146 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/28, B60G11/12 | [1985/33] | CPC: |
B60G11/12 (EP);
F16F1/28 (EP);
F16F1/3686 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, SE [1985/48] |
Former [1985/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, SE | Title | German: | BLATTFEDER AUS MEHRKOMPONENTENWERKSTOFF | [1985/33] | English: | LEAF SPRINGS OF COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [1985/33] | French: | RESSORTS A LAMES EN MATERIAU COMPOSITE | [1985/33] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1985/49: Verbunden mit 84304463.7/0132074 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 02.10.85 | EPB 1985/49: Consolidated with 84304463.7/0132074 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 02.10.85 | EPB 1985/49: Jointe à la demande no. 84304463.7/0132074 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 02.10.85 | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.1985 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/33] | 18.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP58142044 ; | [A]JP54079393 ; | EP0070122 [ ] (GKN TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]); | US2123772 [ ] (EISENHAUER WARREN F); | FR745689 [ ] | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 261, 19 November 1983, page M257, & JP, A, 58 142 044 (Horikiri Bane Seisakusho K.K.) 23 March 1983, & JP58142044 A 19830323 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; vol. 3, No. 105, 5 September 1979, page M71 ; & JP, A, 54 079 393 (Toray K.K.) 25 June 1979, & JP54079393 A 19790625 | Examination | - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 7, no. 261, 19 November 1983, page M257 |