EP0151178 - METHOD FOR MAKING PERMANENT COLORED IMAGES AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1986 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAPHICS, INC. 7901 Beechcraft Avenue Gaithersburg, MD 20879 / US | [1985/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWMAN, William, E. 517 Nelson Street Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 02 /
TAYLOR, Robert, J. 18630 Mustard Seed Court Germantown, MD 20874 / US | [1985/33] | Representative(s) | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84902991.3 | 20.07.1984 | [1985/33] | WO1984US01134 | Priority number, date | US19830515421 | 20.07.1983 Original published format: US 515421 | [1985/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8500671 | Date: | 14.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0151178 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/78, G03B27/32 | [1985/33] | CPC: |
G03F1/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAUERHAFT GEFÄRBTER BILDER UND VORRICHTUNG DAZU | [1985/33] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING PERMANENT COLORED IMAGES AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [1985/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE CREER DES IMAGES COLOREES DE MANIERE DEFINITIVE | [1985/33] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1985 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1985 | Search fee paid | 18.03.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/24] | 09.12.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3258337 (WALTER COUSINS WILLIAM); | [A]US3811767 (PURNELL H); | [A]US4026649 (LEONHART CHARLES J); | [A]US4222655 (NORRIS JOHN T); | [X]US4311784 (FAN ROXY N); | [X]US4377339 (COPPOCK RICHARD A) |