EP0157787 - DISKETTE STORAGE CONTAINER FOR STORING A LARGE QUANTITY OF DISKETTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.04.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INNOVATIVE CONCEPTS INC. 1971 Concourse Drive San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [1985/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONG, Jerry, M. 70 Castlewood Drive Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 02 /
WOMACK, James, A. 16545 Shadyview Lane Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/42] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84903118.2 | 25.07.1984 | [1985/42] | WO1984US01191 | Priority number, date | US19830528398 | 01.09.1983 Original published format: US 528398 | [1985/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501033 | Date: | 14.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0157787 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/30 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
G11B33/0433 (EP,US);
G11B33/0438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | DISKETTENLAGERBEHÄLTER ZUM LAGERN EINER GROSSEN MENGE VON DISKETTEN | [1985/42] | English: | DISKETTE STORAGE CONTAINER FOR STORING A LARGE QUANTITY OF DISKETTES | [1985/42] | French: | BOITE DE STOCKAGE DE DISQUETTES POUVANT CONTENIR UNE GRANDE QUANTITE DE DISQUETTES | [1985/42] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.1985 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.1985 | Search fee paid | 28.05.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/48] | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/23] | 20.01.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1986 | 31.07.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US4478335 (LONG JERRY M [US], et al); | [E]EP0130226 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]); | [A]US4356918 (KAHLE HENRY, et al) | International search | US1483289 [ ] (DOERING WILLIAM M, et al); | US2241989 [ ] (FRIEDRICH CHARLES F, et al); | US2503611 [ ] (SOPHIE E BRUEN, et al); | US3315796 [ ] (HENRY DREYFUSS); | US3370701 [ ] (ACKER JOHN J VAN, et al); | US3392820 [ ] (AZIM WAKEEM R); | US4225038 [ ] (EGLY ROBERT A); | US4397389 [ ] (FINDEISEN ANDREW M [US]); | WO8201810 [ ] (INNOVATIVE CONCEPTS INC [US], et al) |