EP0151632 - A KIT COMPRISING MULTICOLORED FLUID DISPENSER TOGETHER WITH ERADICATING FLUID DISPENSER, STAMPS AND STAMP PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALL-MARK CORPORATION, INC. 15 Sandy Lane P.O. Box 4186 Trenton, NJ 08610 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states ALL-MARK CORPORATION, INC. 15 Sandy Lane P.O. Box 4186 Trenton, NJ 08610 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYDUCHOK, Leon 15 Sandylane Trenton, NJ 08610 / US | 02 /
STRAUSS, Leopold 111-46 76 Drive-5B Forest Hills, NY 11375 / US | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/34] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84903129.9 | 01.08.1984 | [1985/34] | WO1984US01225 | Priority number, date | US19830519921 | 03.08.1983 Original published format: US 519921 | US19840636080 | 31.07.1984 Original published format: US 636080 | [1985/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8500782 | Date: | 28.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0151632 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B43K27/08, B41F31/00, C11D3/395, C09D11/00, C09D11/02, C09D11/16 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
B43L19/0018 (EP,US);
A45C11/36 (EP,US);
B43K27/08 (EP,US);
B43K8/022 (EP,US);
C09D11/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/34] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER, VERSEHEN MIT EINEM MEHRFARBENFLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGEBER, EINEM LÖSCHFLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGEBER, BRIEFMARKEN UND EINEM STEMPELKISSEN | [1985/34] | English: | A KIT COMPRISING MULTICOLORED FLUID DISPENSER TOGETHER WITH ERADICATING FLUID DISPENSER, STAMPS AND STAMP PAD | [1985/34] | French: | TROUSSE COMPORTANT UN DISTRIBUTEUR DE FLUIDES MULTICOLORES AVEC UN DISTRIBUTEUR DE FLUIDE D'EFFACEMENT, DES TIMBRES ET UN TAMPON DE TIMBRE | [1985/34] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1985 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1985 | Search fee paid | 02.05.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 10.09.1985 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 25.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 22.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/27] | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.1987 | 31.08.1988 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2427369 [ ] (KORES HOLDING ZUG AG [CH]); | GB2108831 [ ] (HELIX INTERNATIONAL LTD); | US3941488 [ ] (MAXWELL DAVID) | International search | [Y]US379793 ; | [Y]US2117470 (WALTER ZAREKO); | [Y]US193187 ; | [Y]DE2640724 (KOHLENBACH ULRICH); | [X]US4156657 (LIN AN-CHUNG R [US]); | [Y]US3887287 (ROSH JR DALE M); | [YP]US4413266 (AVIRAM ARI [US], et al) |