EP0156821 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE CONTINUOUS PSYCHROMETRIC MEASUREMENT OF THE CONCENTRATION OF A VAPOROUS COMPONENT IN A GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1988 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SORENSEN, Ansgar Christian Hoffmann Anemonevej 4 DK-3450 Allerod / DK | [1985/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/41] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84903172.9 | 27.08.1984 | [1985/41] | WO1984DK00080 | Priority number, date | DK19830004151 | 13.09.1983 Original published format: DK 415183 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501350 | Date: | 28.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0156821 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156821 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/62 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
G01N25/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN PSYCHROMETRISCHEN MESSEN DER KONZENTRATION EINES GASFÖRMIGEN BESTANDTEILS IN EINEM GAS | [1985/41] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE CONTINUOUS PSYCHROMETRIC MEASUREMENT OF THE CONCENTRATION OF A VAPOROUS COMPONENT IN A GAS | [1985/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE MESURE PSYCHROMETRIQUE CONTINUE DE LA CONCENTRATION D'UN COMPOSANT A L'ETAT DE VAPEUR DANS UN GAZ | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.1985 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/41] | 09.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.11.1987 | BE | 11.11.1987 | [1989/13] |
Former [1989/03] | BE | 11.11.1987 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1227692 (REGULATOR A G); | [X]DE1938464 (KREIBERG OSKAR ALFRED); | [A]DE208453 ; | [A]DE717622 (FRIEDRICH BLUETHNER); | [A]DE1773596 (ICHIKIN KOGYOSHA KK) |