EP0151636 - VEHICLE WINDSHIELD DEFROST APPARATUS WITH REDUCED DASHBOARD SPACE REQUIREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1990 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOWLES FLUIDICS CORPORATION 6625 Dobbin Road Columbia Maryland 21045 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states BOWLES FLUIDICS CORPORATION 6625 Dobbin Road Columbia Maryland 21045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOUFFER, Ronald, Denton 14120 Ansted Road Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/34] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84903216.4 | 09.08.1984 | [1985/34] | WO1984US01248 | Priority number, date | US19830522884 | 12.08.1983 Original published format: US 522884 | [1985/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8500783 | Date: | 28.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0151636 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151636 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/34 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
B60H1/242 (EP,US);
B60S1/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/34] | B60H1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1989/11] |
Former [1985/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | ENTEISUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGSCHEIBEN MIT REDUZIERTEN ARMATURENBRETT-RAUMANFORDERUNGEN | [1985/34] | English: | VEHICLE WINDSHIELD DEFROST APPARATUS WITH REDUCED DASHBOARD SPACE REQUIREMENTS | [1985/34] | French: | APPAREIL DE DEGIVRAGE DE PARE-BRISE DE VEHICULE NECESSITANT MOINS DE PLACE SUR LE TABLEAU DE BORD | [1985/34] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1985 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1985 | Search fee paid | 26.03.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 08.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4052002 (STOUFFER RONALD D, et al) | International search | [A]US3608469 (MUTOH NORIO, et al); | [A]US3745906 (KAKEI J, et al); | [A]US3832939 (KAKEI J, et al); | [A]DE2847678 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]US4250799 (STOUFFER RONALD D); | [A]US4428277 (STOUFFER RONALD D [US]) |