EP0156848 - DEVICE FOR THE CONTROL AND POSITIONING OF PIRN BARS FOR KNITTING MACHINES OR CROCHET GALLOON WEAVING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXTILMA AG Seestrasse 97 6052 Hergiswil / NW / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states Textilma AG Seestrasse 97 CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUEGER, Claus Landstr. 40 CH-5264 Gipf-Oberfrick / CH | [1985/41] | Application number, filing date | 84903472.3 | 25.09.1984 | [1985/41] | WO1984CH00151 | Priority number, date | CH19830005409 | 05.10.1983 Original published format: CH 540983 | [1985/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501528 | Date: | 11.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0156848 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D04B27/24 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
D04B27/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | ANTRIEB UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG VON SCHUSS-STANGEN AN KETTENWIRK- ODER HAEKELGALON-WEBMASCHINEN | [1985/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE CONTROL AND POSITIONING OF PIRN BARS FOR KNITTING MACHINES OR CROCHET GALLOON WEAVING MACHINES | [1985/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET DE POSITIONNEMENT DES BARRES DE TRAME POUR METIERS A TRICOTER OU METIERS A CROCHETS POUR GALONS | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 06.09.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/14] | 10.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1986/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.07.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.10.1985 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2306906 (PAUL SCHONFELD, et al); | [A]DE1807035 (MAYER TEXTILMASCHF); | [A]DE2925683 (SULZER AG) |