EP0150019 - Method of electrolyzing using liquid electrolytes and porous electrodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tetzlaff, Karl-Heinz Mörikestrasse 6 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 02 /
Schmid, Dieter, Dr. Ostring 132 D-6231 Schwalbach/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Russow, Jürgen, Dr. Am Schieferberg 45 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [1985/31] | Application number, filing date | 85100186.7 | 10.01.1985 | [1985/31] | Priority number, date | DE19843401638 | 19.01.1984 Original published format: DE 3401638 | [1985/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0150019 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150019 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25B15/08, C25B9/00 | [1985/31] | CPC: |
C25B15/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/46109 (EP,US);
C25B9/17 (EP,US);
C25B9/70 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46161 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/31] | Title | German: | Elektrolyseverfahren mit flüssigen Elektrolyten und porösen Elektroden | [1985/31] | English: | Method of electrolyzing using liquid electrolytes and porous electrodes | [1985/31] | French: | Procédé d'électrolyse employant des électrolytes liquides et des électrodes poreuses | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 01.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Request for further processing for: | 13.10.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3647653 [ ] (CARLSON GORDON A); | DE2534357 [ ] (ONTARIO LTD); | US4389287 [ ] (SKALA STEPHEN F [US]) | [ ] - CHEMIE INGENIEUR TECHNIK, 41. Jahrgang, Erstes September-Heft 1969, Heft 17, Weinheim, Bergstrabe F. BECK et al. "Entwicklung neuer Zellen fur elektro-organische Synthesen" Seiten 943-950 * Abb. 2, Seite 945 * | [ ] - CHEMIE INGENIEUR TECHNIK, 55. Jahrgang 1983, Nr. 1, Weinheim, Bergstrabe G. KREYSA "Elektrochemie mit dreidimensionalen Elektroden" Seiten 23-30 | Examination | FR2514376 |