EP0150021 - Polyphenylene ether resin compositions having improved melt flow and paintability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/31] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Gim Fun, Jr. 11 Drawbridge Drive Albany New York 12203 / US | [1985/31] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Kaiserstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Kaiserstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85100202.2 | 10.01.1985 | [1985/31] | Priority number, date | US19840572638 | 20.01.1984 Original published format: US 572638 | [1985/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150021 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150021 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/04, C08L51/04 | [1985/31] | CPC: |
C08L51/04 (EP);
C08L71/123 (EP);
C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L75/00 (EP);
C08L83/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L71/123, C08L2666/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/31] | Title | German: | Polyphenylenätherharzzusammensetzungen mit verbessertem Schmelzfliess- und Überzugsvermögen | [1985/31] | English: | Polyphenylene ether resin compositions having improved melt flow and paintability | [1985/31] | French: | Compositions de résines polyphénylènether ayant une fluidité à l'état fondue et une peignabilité améliorée | [1985/31] | File destroyed: | 10.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 07.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/10] | 01.10.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0033146 ; | [X]FR2073872 |