EP0187878 - Device adaptable to a heat radiator with at least one rod for suspending articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Zehnder AG Radiatorenfabrik Oberfeldstrasse 345 CH-5722 Gränichen / CH | [1986/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zehnder, Andreas Ruusstrasse 18 CH-5722 Gränichen / CH | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Morva, Tibor Morva Patentdienste Hintere Vorstadt 34 Postfach 5001 Aarau / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | Morva, Tibor Morva Patentdienste Hintere Vorstadt 34 Postfach CH-5001 Aarau / CH | Application number, filing date | 85100313.7 | 14.01.1985 | [1986/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0187878 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0187878 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D06F57/12, F24D19/00 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
D06F57/127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/30] | Title | German: | Heizungsradiatoranordnung mit mindestens einer zum Aufhängen von Gegenständen dienenden Stange | [1986/30] | English: | Device adaptable to a heat radiator with at least one rod for suspending articles | [1986/30] | French: | Dispositif s'adaptant à un radiateur de chauffage comprenant au moins une barre pour la suspension d'articles | [1986/30] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 28.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1561575 (SWANSON PETER J); | [A]CH311774 (BUEHLER EMIL [CH]); | [A]FR1216606 ; | [A]DE1909762U (GISY ERHARD [DE]); | [A]DE1911992 (FREIFRAU VON DER TRENCK GEB SC); | [A]CH527314 (STEINER WALTER [CH]); | [A]FR2123872 (CREMILLEUX JEAN); | [A]DE7301778U |