EP0154118 - Cycle, in particular racing cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOUR MECCANICA S.r.l. Via F.lli Bronzetti, 31 I-20129 Milan / IT | [1985/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarocco, Pietro Via Petrarca 30 I-21042 Caronno Pertusella Varese / IT | 02 /
Turconi, Alberto Via Damiano Chiesa, 88 I-21042 Caronno Pertusella Varese / IT | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 I-20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85100314.5 | 14.01.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | IT19840019179 | 16.01.1984 Original published format: IT 1917984 | [1985/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0154118 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0154118 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B62K3/04 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
B62J1/02 (EP);
B62J1/08 (EP);
B62K3/04 (EP);
B62M1/38 (EP);
B62M9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/37] | Title | German: | Fahrrad, insbesondere Rennfahrrad | [1985/37] | English: | Cycle, in particular racing cycle | [1985/37] | French: | Vélo de course | [1985/37] | File destroyed: | 21.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/04] | 01.09.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US545421 ; | [A]GB189806617 (MATTHEWS MARMADUKE [CA], et al); | [A]GB270991 (HENRY HUET NELSON); | [A]AT110312B (TERRY ALBERT VICTOR [GB]); | [A]FR45668E ; | [Y]CH236146 (BAETTIG OSKAR [CH]); | [Y]EP0010201 (DENK ANTON [DE], et al); | [A]DE3043931 (KLOSE ODO [DE]) |