EP0167697 - Injection timing advance device for injection pumps for combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nolte, Albert Vaster Strasse 10 D-5000 Köln 30 / DE | 02 /
Altdorf, Joachim Frankfurter Strasse 248 D-5000 Köln 30 / DE | [1986/03] | Application number, filing date | 85100357.4 | 15.01.1985 | [1986/03] | Priority number, date | DE19843418321 | 17.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3418321 | [1986/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0167697 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167697 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F02D1/18, F16D3/10 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
F02D1/18 (EP);
F02D1/183 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/03] | Title | German: | Einspritzzeitpunktversteller einer Einspritzpumpe für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1986/03] | English: | Injection timing advance device for injection pumps for combustion engines | [1986/03] | French: | Mécanisme d'avance de l'injection pour des pompes à injection de moteurs à combustion | [1986/03] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 29.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 24.01.1990 | [1990/34] | Documents cited: | Search | JP59037232 [ ]; | GB2029934 [ ] (SANWA SEIKI MFG CO LTD, et al); | US3401572 [ ] (BAILEY JOHN M); | EP0122399 [ ] (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]); | GB2123493 [ ] (LUCAS IND PLC); | DE2525746 [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR); | FR895657 [ ] (HEBERLEIN & CO AG); | GB1242659 [ ] (FIAT SPA [IT]); | GB2019613 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 136, (M-304) (1573), 23. Juni 1984; & JP,A,59 037 232 (YANMAR DIESEL K.K.) 29.02.1984, zusammenfassung., & JP59037232 A 00000000 | Examination | - Patents Abstracts of Japan,vol.8, no.136(M-304)(1573), 23.06.1984 |