EP0167699 - Gong striking clock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.1988 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Jauch KG, Uhrenfabrik BahnhofStrasse 68 Postfach 85 D-7212 Deisslingen / DE | [1986/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nopper, Kurt Staig-Strasse 8 D-7737 Bad Dürrheim7 / DE | 02 /
Jauch, Hermann, Dr. Rottweiler Strasse 34 D-7212 Deisslingen / DE | [1986/03] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Axel, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | [1986/03] | Application number, filing date | 85100446.5 | 17.01.1985 | [1986/03] | Priority number, date | DE19843401688 | 19.01.1984 Original published format: DE 3401688 | [1986/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0167699 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G04B21/08, G04B37/00 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
G04B21/08 (EP,US);
G04B37/0066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1986/03] | Title | German: | Grossuhr mit Gongschlagwerk | [1986/03] | English: | Gong striking clock | [1986/03] | French: | Horloge avec sonnerie à gong | [1986/03] | File destroyed: | 10.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 03.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/29] | 19.02.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.03.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE420133 ; | [Y]DE1145558 (JUNGHANS GEB AG); | [A]GB191018108 (LAKE HAROLD WILLIAMSON [GB]); | [A]DE457887 (URGOS UHREN UND GONGFABRIK G M); | [A]US1424677 (PORTER WILSON E) |