EP0154772 - Bipolar plate for an apparatus made of a stack of electrochemical cells with solid electrolyte, and its manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1987/36] |
Former [1985/38] | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christen, Hans-Jörg Rosenstrasse 6 CH-5417 Untersiggenthal / CH | 02 /
Devanty, Hubert, Dr. Chrüzlibergweg 8 CH-5432 Neuenhof / CH | 03 /
Schellenberg, Claude Chileweg 4 CH-5413 Birmenstorf / CH | 04 /
Scherer, Günther, Dr. Birchhof 8 CH-5412 Gebenstorf / CH | 05 /
Stucki, Samuel, Dr. Sternenstrasse 7 CH-5415 Nussbaumen / CH | [1988/31] |
Former [1985/38] | 01 /
Christen, Hans-Jörg Rosenstrasse 6 CH-5417 Untersiggenthal / CH | ||
02 /
Devantay, Hubert, Dr. Chrüzlibergweg 8 CH-5432 Neuenhof / CH | |||
03 /
Schellenberg, Claude Chileweg 4 CH-5413 Birmenstorf / CH | |||
04 /
Scherer, Günther, Dr. Birchhof 8 CH-5412 Gebenstorf / CH | |||
05 /
Stucki, Samuel, Dr. Sternenstrasse 7 CH-5415 Nussbaumen / CH | Application number, filing date | 85100473.9 | 18.01.1985 | [1985/38] | Priority number, date | CH19840000354 | 26.01.1984 Original published format: CH 35484 | [1985/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0154772 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154772 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25B9/00, H01M8/24, C25B11/02 | [1985/38] | CPC: |
H01M8/0204 (EP,US);
C25B9/70 (EP,US);
H01M8/0206 (EP,US);
H01M8/0213 (EP,US);
H01M8/0226 (EP,US);
H01M8/0228 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/38] | Title | German: | Bipolarplatte für einen aus mehreren elektrochemischen Zellen mit Feststoffelektrolyt aufgebauten stapelartigen Apparat und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1985/38] | English: | Bipolar plate for an apparatus made of a stack of electrochemical cells with solid electrolyte, and its manufacturing process | [1985/38] | French: | Plaque bipolaire pour appareil comprenant un empilement de cellules électrochimiques à électrolyte solide, et son procédé de fabrication | [1985/38] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 14.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 03.08.1988 | [1997/17] |
Former [1989/24] | SE | 03.08.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB978977 (NAT RES DEV); | [Y]US4210511 (CAMPBELL BARRIE C [US], et al); | [Y]US4217401 (PELLEGRI ALBERTO [IT], et al); | [Y]US4339322 (BALKO EDWARD N, et al) | Examination | - Direct Energy Conversion Programs, "Feasibility Study of SPE Fuel Cell Power Plants for Automotive Applications", P.O. 9-L61-3863V-1, prepared for University of California Los Alamos National Laboratory, General Electric, Lanl-2, November 17, 1981 | - S. Stucki and R. Müller, "Evaluation of materials for a water electrolyzer of the membrane type", Hydrogen Energy Progress, Proceedings of the 3rd World Hydrogen Energy Conference held in Tokyo, Japan, 23-26 June 1980, pp. 1799-1808, Pergamon Press |