EP0150860 - Fiber optic connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plummer, William T. 129 Arena Terrace Concord, MA 01742 / US | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Haibach, Tino, et al Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp Postfach 12 11 20 80035 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Haibach, Tino, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp, Postfach 12 11 20 D-80035 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/32] | Haibach, Tino, Dr. Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp P.O. Box 121120 D-8000 München 12 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101060.3 | 01.02.1985 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | US19840576490 | 02.02.1984 Original published format: US 576490 | [1985/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150860 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150860 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150860 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
G02B6/2817 (EP);
G02B6/32 (EP);
G02B6/322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/32] | Title | German: | Faseroptischer Verbinder | [1985/32] | English: | Fiber optic connector | [1985/32] | French: | Coupleur à fibre optique | [1985/32] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 08.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Request for further processing for: | 23.03.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0032722 ; | [A]FR2353069 ; | [A]FR2500642 ; | [YP]EP0121369 | [Y] - ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, vol. 64, no. 12, December 1981, pages 86-95, Scripta Publishing Co., Silver Spring, Maryland, US; H. YAMAMOTO et al.: "10 x 10 Optical matrix switch" | [Y] - JOURNAL OF OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 1, no. 2, November 1980, pages 74-79, Fachverlag Schiele & Schön, Berlin, DE; H. YAMAMOTO et al.: "Large-scale and low-loss optical switch matrix for optical switching systems" | [A] - REVIEW OF THE ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION LABORATORIES, vol. 29, no. 11-12, November/December 1981, pages 1241-1255, Tokyo, JP; K. HASHIMOTO et al.: "Active and passive optical devices for use in medium/small capacity and intra-office optical fiber transmission systems" |