EP0163808 - Printing apparatus using heated ink composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/50] | Printing apparatus and method using heated ink composition | ||
[1989/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARKEM CORPORATION 150 Congress Street Keene, New Hampshire 03431 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states MARKEM CORPORATION 150 Congress Street Keene New Hampshire 03431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perra, Andrew G., Jr. Park Street North Swanzey New Hampshire 03431 / US | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al C/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 85101118.9 | 04.02.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | US19840605472 | 30.04.1984 Original published format: US 605472 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163808 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163808 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163808 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/00, B41F13/22 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
B41F13/22 (EP,US);
B41F31/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Drucken mit erwärmter Farbe | [1989/36] | English: | Printing apparatus using heated ink composition | [1989/36] | French: | Dispositif pour imprimer avec une encre chauffée | [1989/36] |
Former [1985/50] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Drucken mit erwärmter Farbe | ||
Former [1985/50] | Printing apparatus and method using heated ink composition | ||
Former [1985/50] | Procédé et dispositif pour imprimer avec une encre chauffée | Examination procedure | 07.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 14.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3412707 (WEST LLOYD L) |