EP0158028 - Random access memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isobe, Mitsuo c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101311.0 | 07.02.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | JP19840035494 | 27.02.1984 Original published format: JP 3549484 | [1988/01] |
Former [1985/42] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158028 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158028 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/00 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
G11C11/21 (KR);
G11C11/40 (KR);
G11C7/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/42] | Title | German: | Direktzugriffspeicheranordnung | [1985/42] | English: | Random access memory device | [1985/42] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à accès aléatoire | [1985/42] | File destroyed: | 13.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 04.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 29.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/16] | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5528536 ; | [X]US4272832 (ITO TSUNEO); | [A]EP0017990 (NEC CORP [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 58 (P-9)[540], 30th April 1980; & JP-A-55 28 536 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 29-02-1980, & JP5528536 A 00000000 | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-13, no. 5, October 1978, pages 635-639, IEEE, New York, US; T. WADA et al.: "A 15-ns 1024-bit fully static MOS RAM" | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-17, no. 5, October 1982, pages 804-809, IEEE, New York, US; Y. UCHIDA et al.: "A low power resistive load 64 kbit CMOS RAM" |