EP0154201 - Process for the aftertreatment of aluminium oxide layers with aqueous solutions containing alkali-metal silicate, and their use in the production of supports for off-set printing plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1988 [1988/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simon, Ulrich, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Fontanestrasse 41 D-6500 Mainz 31 / DE | 02 /
Beutel, Reiner Wiesenhain 8 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 03 /
Sprintschnik, Gerhard, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Rossbachhöhe 30 D-6204 Taunusstein 4 / DE | [1985/37] | Application number, filing date | 85101402.7 | 09.02.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | DE19843406102 | 21.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3406102 | [1985/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0154201 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154201 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/24, C25D11/08, C25F3/04, B41N1/08, B41N3/00 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
B41N3/038 (EP);
C25D11/20 (EP);
C25D11/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Nachbehandlung von Aluminiumoxidschichten mit Alkalimetallsilikat enthaltenden wässrigen Lösungen und deren Verwendung bei der Herstellung von Offsetdruckplattenträgern | [1985/37] | English: | Process for the aftertreatment of aluminium oxide layers with aqueous solutions containing alkali-metal silicate, and their use in the production of supports for off-set printing plates | [1985/37] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement postérieur de couches d'oxyde d'aluminium avec solutions aqueuses contenant du silicate de métal alcalin et leur utilisation pour la fabrication de supports pour plaques d'impression offset | [1985/37] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/11] | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0095581 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]); | DE3232485 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]); | GB764442 [ ] (POLYCHROME CORP) |