EP0152891 - Jet nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/35] | Submerged jet injection nozzle | ||
[1988/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUGINO MACHINE LIMITED 2410 Hongo Uozu-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | For all designated states Yanaida, Katsuya 8-13 Onokosei 2-chome Shigacho Shiga-gun Shiga-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states SUGINO MACHINE LIMITED 2410 Hongo Uozu-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Yanaida, Katsuya 8-13 Onokosei 2-chome Shigacho Shiga-gun Shiga-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugino, Kenji 700-1 Tomomichi Uozu-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Yanaida, Katsuya 8-13 Onokosei 2-chome, Shigaco Sigagun, Shiga-ken / JP | 03 /
Sugino, Hiroshi 11-35 Matsuoicho Nihinomiya, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakaya, Masao 430 Maezawa, Kurobe-shi Toyama-ken / JP | 05 /
Eda, Kensaku 558-3 Mukaishinjo Toyama-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | 06 /
Nishida, Nobuo 17 Kamiichimachi Minamimachi Nakaniikawa-gun, Toyama-ken / JP | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Plöger, Ulrich Benrather Schlossallee 89 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Plöger, Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing. Benrather Schlossallee 89 D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101449.8 | 11.02.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | JP19840025681 | 13.02.1984 Original published format: JP 2568184 | [1985/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0152891 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152891 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/34, // B08B3/02, B24C5/04 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
B05B17/00 (EP,US);
B05B1/02 (EP,US);
B08B3/02 (EP,US);
B24C5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/35] | Title | German: | Strahlspritzdüse | [1988/22] | English: | Jet nozzle | [1988/22] | French: | Buse d'injection | [1988/22] |
Former [1985/35] | Unterwasser-Strahlspritzdüse | ||
Former [1985/35] | Submerged jet injection nozzle | ||
Former [1985/35] | Buse d'injection en plongée | Examination procedure | 19.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 26.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS5610357 [ ] (BABCOCK HITACHI KK); | GB1500746 [ ] (DITLEV SIMONSEN O); | GB1596070 [ ] (SPECK KOLBENPUMPEN FABRIK); | US3263934 [ ] (HOPE JR HERBERT W, et al); | EP0066432 [ ] (LEXEL CORP [US]); | US4036438 [ ] (SODERLIND RICHARD LEROY, et al); | US4060874 [ ] (FURUTSUTSUMI YASUZI); | DE2234669 [ ] |