EP0152896 - Suppositories containing ceftriaxone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Füller, Walter, Dr. Pappelstrasse 5 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101476.1 | 12.02.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | CH19840000858 | 22.02.1984 Original published format: CH 85884 | [1985/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0152896 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0152896 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/545, A61K9/02 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/02 (EP,US);
A61K31/545 (EP,US);
Y10S424/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Suppositorien enthaltend Ceftriaxon | [1985/35] | English: | Suppositories containing ceftriaxone | [1985/35] | French: | Suppositoires contenant de la ceftriaxone | [1985/35] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 12.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/35] | 20.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/41] | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2700765 (KALI CHEMIE PHARMA GMBH); | FR2427100 [ ] (KALI CHEMIE PHARMA GMBH [DE]); | [Y]FR2437100 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [X]EP0091502 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [XP]EP0108295 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) |