EP0152112 - Olefin conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.1989 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kukes, Simon Gregory 6311 S.E. Belmont Rd. Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 02 /
Banks, Robert Louis 5610 S.E. Cornell Dr. Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/34] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101616.2 | 14.02.1985 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | US19840580402 | 15.02.1984 Original published format: US 580402 | [1985/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0152112 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0152112 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/30, C07C6/04, C07C5/22 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J23/30 (EP,US);
C07C5/2562 (EP,US);
C07C2521/06 (EP,US);
C07C2521/08 (EP,US);
C07C2523/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/2562, C07C11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/34] | Title | German: | Umwandlung von Olefinen | [1985/34] | English: | Olefin conversion | [1985/34] | French: | Conversion d'oléfines | [1985/34] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 25.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/18] | 12.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 23.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 10.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.12.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/07] | Request for further processing for: | 10.05.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2254367 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US4125736 (LEACH BRUCE E); | [X]US4233139 (MURRELL LAWRENCE L, et al) |