EP0174422 - Device for the rigid mechanical transmission of rotational movements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wegmann & Co. GmbH August-Bode-Strasse 1 D-34127 Kassel / DE | [1986/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heldmann, Heinrich, Ing. (grad) Huttenplatz 5 D-3500 Kassel / DE | 02 /
Wallwey, Erich Beethovenstrasse 17 D-3502 Vellmar / DE | [1986/12] | Representative(s) | Feder, Heinrich, et al Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | Feder, Heinz, Dr., et al Dominikanerstrasse 37 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101867.1 | 21.02.1985 | [1986/12] | Priority number, date | DE19843433111 | 08.09.1984 Original published format: DE 3433111 | [1986/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0174422 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0174422 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0174422 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/06, F41F21/06 | [1986/12] | CPC: |
F16D3/04 (EP);
F16D3/00 (EP);
F16D3/38 (EP);
F41A27/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL [1986/12] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur mechanischen winkelgetreuen Übertragung von Drehbewegungen | [1986/12] | English: | Device for the rigid mechanical transmission of rotational movements | [1986/12] | French: | Dispositif pour la transmission rigide mécanique de mouvement rotatif | [1986/12] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 29.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB540808 (HENRY JOHN JAMES REDWOOD, et al); | [Y]GB1482231 (MOULTON DEVELOPMENT LTD); | [YD]GB1605107 (WEGMANN & CO); | [A]FR2446959 (HUTCHINSON MAPA); | [A]FR2450381 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US3411324 (FEDERLINE CALVIN W) | Examination | DE2552009 |