EP0158792 - Power shovel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich Wilh. Schwing GmbH Postfach 247 Heerstrasse 9-27 D-44653 Herne / DE | [1985/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Güthoff, Wilfred Marderweg 10a D-5810 Witten / DE | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, et al Schaeferstrasse 18 44623 Herne / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schaeferstrasse 18 D-44623 Herne / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102003.2 | 23.02.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | DE19843411866 | 30.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3411866 | [1985/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0158792 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158792 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/40, E02F3/42, E02F3/96 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
E02F3/364 (EP,US);
E02F3/3663 (EP,US);
E02F3/3677 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Löffelbagger | [1985/43] | English: | Power shovel | [1985/43] | French: | Pelle mécanique | [1985/43] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 28.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 27.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0011766 (SCHWING GMBH F [DE]); | [A]EP0046854 (SCHWING GMBH F [DE]); | [A]DE7717567U |