EP0155543 - Closure for control box doors and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1992 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg D-35745 Herborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Debus, Jürgen Am Ebersbach 50 D-6344 Dietzhölztal 1 / DE | 02 /
Zachrei, Jürgen Am Hungersberg 2 D-6341 Dillenburg 8 / DE | 03 /
Bütergerds, Helmut Jahnstrasse 12 D-6345 Eschenburg 1 / DE | 04 /
Wetzel, Manfred Hauptstrasse 13 D-6344 Ewersbach / DE | [1985/39] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 Postfach 11 65 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | Vogel, Georg Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 Postfach 11 65 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102027.1 | 23.02.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | DE19843407700 | 02.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3407700 | [1985/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155543 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155543 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155543 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/04, E05B5/02, E05B13/00 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
E05B13/002 (EP,US);
E05B1/0092 (EP,US);
Y10S292/31 (EP,US);
Y10T292/0843 (EP,US);
Y10T292/57 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5757 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1985/39] | E05C9/04, E05B5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/39] | Title | German: | Verschluss für Schaltschranktüren und dgl. | [1985/39] | English: | Closure for control box doors and the like | [1985/39] | French: | Fermeture pour portes d'armoire de commande et similaires | [1985/39] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/01] | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.07.1991 | NL | 10.07.1991 | SE | 10.07.1991 | CH | 29.02.1992 | LI | 29.02.1992 | LU | 29.02.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1993/01] | BE | 10.07.1991 | |
NL | 10.07.1991 | ||
SE | 10.07.1991 | ||
CH | 29.02.1992 | ||
LI | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | BE | 10.07.1991 | |
NL | 10.07.1991 | ||
SE | 10.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/10] | NL | 10.07.1991 | |
SE | 10.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/09] | NL | 10.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE7014950U ; | [A]US2514317 (HOMER EICHACKER); | [A]US3745796 (FLEMING R); | [A]DE2813677 (ELKEM SPIGERVERKET AS); | [A]DE2803805 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK); | [AD]DE8032588U ; | [XP]DE8406481U |