EP0153726 - Safety belt retractor with tension device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOFLUG GMBH Industriestrasse 10 D-25462 Rellingen / DE | [1985/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Butenop, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Obendeich 29 D-2209 Herzhorn / DE | 02 /
Kröger, Doris Burdiekstrasse 11 D-2200 Elmshorn / DE | [1985/36] | Representative(s) | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [1985/36] | Kühnemann, Klaus Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Kühnemann Dr.-Ing. Karl-Ernst Müller Sonderburgstrasse 36 D-4000 Düsseldorf 11 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102081.8 | 26.02.1985 | [1985/36] | Priority number, date | DE19843407378 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3407378 | [1985/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0153726 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0153726 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/46 | [1985/36] | CPC: |
B60R22/4619 (EP,US);
B60R2022/468 (EP,US);
B60R22/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/36] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsgurtaufroller mit Strammvorrichtung | [1985/36] | English: | Safety belt retractor with tension device | [1985/36] | French: | Enrouleur de ceinture de sécurité ayant un dispositif tendeur | [1985/36] | File destroyed: | 13.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0093238 (BAYERN CHEMIE GMBH FLUGCHEMIE [DE]); | [A]FR2491340 (REPA FEINSTANZWERK GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0093233 (BAYERN CHEMIE GMBH FLUGCHEMIE [DE]); | [AD]DE2823334 (AUTOFLUG GMBH); | [AD]DE3040667 (AUTOFLUG GMBH [DE]) |