EP0171493 - Process and lacquer for making abrasion-resistant coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.11.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 D-80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Philipp, Gottfried, Dr. Oskar-Popp-Strasse 7 D-8702 Kist / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Helmut, Dr. Tilman-Riemenschneider-Strasse 15 D-8706 Höchberg / DE | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102099.0 | 26.02.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | DE19843407087 | 27.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3407087 | [1986/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0171493 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0171493 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171493 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/04, C08G77/58 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
C08G77/58 (EP,US);
C09D183/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/08] | C09D3/82, C08G77/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Lack zur Herstellung von kratzfesten Beschichtungen | [1986/08] | English: | Process and lacquer for making abrasion-resistant coatings | [1986/08] | French: | Procédé et laque pour la fabrication de revêtements résistant à l'abrasion | [1986/08] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/30: Teilanmeldung 89122229.1 eingereicht am 26/02/85 | EPB 1990/30: Divisional application 89122229.1 filed on 26/02/85 | EPB 1990/30: Demande divisionnaire 89122229.1 déposée le 26/02/85 | Examination procedure | 05.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/33] | 12.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89122229.1 / EP0373451 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.1991
11.04.1991
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Werk Lülsdorf Standort Troisdorf Postfach 1347 D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | [1991/20] | 31.05.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.12.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.05.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.1992 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.07.1992 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.10.1993 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/03] | Appeal following opposition | 04.09.1992 | Appeal received No. T0827/92 | 14.11.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.10.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.04.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2287489 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [X]FR2413415 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]EP0011209 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]GB2068010 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD, et al) |