EP0158100 - Poison rod for use in a nuclear reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1990 [1990/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paul, Gary Edward 350 Deauville Drive, Apt. 6 Monroeville Pennsylvania 15146 / US | 02 /
Carr, Ronald Harra 2524 Columbia Avenue Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15218 / US | 03 /
Stern, Lee William 111 Spring Grove Road Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Holzer, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) W. Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Holzer Dipl.-Ing. (FH) W. Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102297.0 | 01.03.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | US19840594156 | 28.03.1984 Original published format: US 594156 | [1985/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0158100 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158100 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G21C7/10 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
G21C7/103 (EP,US);
C04B24/24 (KR);
G21C7/10 (KR);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | Giftstab zur Benutzung in einem Kernreaktor | [1985/42] | English: | Poison rod for use in a nuclear reactor | [1985/42] | French: | Barre de poison à utiliser dans un réacteur nucléaire | [1985/42] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 22.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2041723 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [A]FR2313743 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]US4169760 (BEVILACQUA FRANK [US]); | [A]EP0029399 (PECHINEY UGINE KUHLMANN URAN [FR]) |