EP0154324 - Scroll compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Toshiyuki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Wakayama Works No. 5-66, Tebira 6-chome Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | 02 /
Sugihara, Masahiro c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Wakayama Works No. 5-66, Tebira 6-chome Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | 03 /
Inaba, Tsutomu c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Wakayama Works No. 5-66, Tebira 6-chome Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | 04 /
Kimura, Tadashi c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Wakayama Works No. 5-66, Tebira 6-chome Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102452.1 | 05.03.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | JP19840042503 | 05.03.1984 Original published format: JP 4250384 | [1985/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0154324 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0154324 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154324 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/02 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
F04C29/023 (EP,US);
F04C18/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/37] | Title | German: | Spiralrippenverdichter | [1985/37] | English: | Scroll compressor | [1985/37] | French: | Compresseur à spirales imbriquées | [1985/37] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 02.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58067983 ; | [AP]JP59000584 ; | [X]FR2519094 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 159 (M-228)[1304], 13th July 1983; & JP-A-58 067 983 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 22-04-1983, & JP58067983 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 83 (M-290)[1520] 17thApril 1984; & JP-A-59 000 584 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 05.01.1984, & JP59000584 A 00000000 | Examination | JP5867983 | JP59584 | - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 159 (M-228)[1304], 13th July 1983; & JP-A-58 67 983 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 22-04-1983, & JP5867983 A 00000000 | - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 83 (M-290)[1520] 17thApril 1984; & JP-A-59 584 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 05.01.1984, & JP59584 A 00000000 |