EP0161403 - Protective relay for a power system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1988 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usui, Masaji MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Power and Ind. Systems Center 1-2 Wadasakicho 1 chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo / JP | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102567.6 | 24.12.1982 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | JP19810212415 | 29.12.1981 Original published format: JP 21241581 | JP19820035383 | 05.03.1982 Original published format: JP 3538382 | JP19820035391 | 05.03.1982 Original published format: JP 3539182 | JP19820035392 | 05.03.1982 Original published format: JP 3539282 | JP19820035393 | 05.03.1982 Original published format: JP 3539382 | [1985/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0161403 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161403 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/28 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
H02H7/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Schutzrelais für Starkstromnetze | [1985/47] | English: | Protective relay for a power system | [1985/47] | French: | Relais de protection pour réseau de courant fort | [1985/47] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82112011.0 / EP0083097 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3984734 [ ] (BECKER MICHAEL) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, section E, vol. 4, no. 1, January 1, 1980 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 135 E 163 * JP - A - 54-142 545 ( TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, section E, vol. 1, no. 155, December 12, 1977 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 8389 E 77 * JP - A - 52-98 954 ( MEIDENSHA K.K. ) * |